skip to content

Buba, Melanie Adriana

CPSO#: 95552

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Buba, Melanie (used until: 17 Jul 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont.
Division of Pediatric Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2898
Fax: (613) 738-4878 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

151 Brewer Way
Ottawa ON  K1S 5T1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Buba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Buba ( CPSO# 95552 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Pediatric Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-6370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE ADRIANA BUBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015