skip to content

Brynjarsson, Hrolfur

CPSO#: 91048

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Iceland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010