skip to content

Bryant, Derek Wesley

CPSO#: 99437

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Northwest Territories

Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 29 Oct 2012
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017