skip to content

Bryan, Jennifer Marie

CPSO#: 89014

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Ahmed, Jennifer Marie (used until: 12 Feb 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Rfe Gs 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3111 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J.M. Bryan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bryan ( CPSO# 89014 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
RFE GS-480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (476) 340-3856

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MARIE BRYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013