skip to content

Bruyere, Jean-Charles

CPSO#: 18489

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jul 1994

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:29 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Feb 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007