skip to content

Bruni, Silvio Giancarlo

CPSO#: 97842

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Radiology
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487580 Ext. 7522 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.G. Bruni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bruni ( CPSO# 97842 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Radiology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
Queensway Health Center
150 Sherway Drive
Mississauga ON  M9C 1A5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SILVIO GIANCARLO BRUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2018