skip to content

Bruni, Joseph

CPSO#: 22811

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
55 Queen Street East
Suite 927
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5501
Fax: (416) 864-5631 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 28 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPH BRUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1970