skip to content

Brunet, Donald George

CPSO#: 29849

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Apr 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Donald Brunet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 1. Paitent Records Kingston Health Sciences Centre 76 Stuart St Kingston, ON K7L 2V7 2. Martins Data Management 95 Terryfox Dr Kingston ON K7M 8N4 Tel: (613) 542-4510
Date Received: 27 Aug 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective:27 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Aug 2018