skip to content

Brunet, Anne-Marie

CPSO#: 91574

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
Department of Family Medicine
713 chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anne-Marie Brunet Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brunet ( CPSO# 91574 )

Business Address:
Hopital Montfort
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE BRUNET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011