skip to content

Brulotte, Marc

CPSO#: 93404

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
1650 Queensdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1T 1N8
Phone: (613) 244-4400
Fax: (613) 244-3399 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marc Brulotte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brulotte ( CPSO# 93404 )

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2430

Business Address:
570 Lacolle Way
Orleans ON  K4A 0N9
Phone Number: (613) 830-8388

Business Address:
705 Cotton Mill Street
Suite 109
Cornwall ON  K6H 7K7
Phone Number: (613) 209-4051

Business Address:
2 - 1650 Queensdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1T 1N8
Phone Number: (613) 244-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARC BRULOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRULOTTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012