skip to content

Brukson, Aleksei

CPSO#: 94571

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Brukson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brukson ( CPSO# 94571 )

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEKSEI BRUKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUKSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 21 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012