skip to content

Brubacher, Lloyd Elverne

CPSO#: 19951

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jun 1966

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lloyd E. Brubacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 36 Heritage Dr Ilderton ON N0M 2A0 or Mount Hope 200 College Ave London ON N6A 1Y1
Date Received: 14 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019