skip to content

Brown-Shreves, Danielle Nikisha

CPSO#: 93105

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3100
222 King St E
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 440-3600
Fax: (905) 697-7745 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Danielle Brown-Shreves Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brown-Shreves ( CPSO# 93105 )

Business Address:
2000 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1G 8C4
Phone Number: (905) 721-3040

Business Address:
Suite 201
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1B 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 419-8000

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIELLE NIKISHA BROWN-SHREVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN-SHREVES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012