skip to content

Brown, Mitchell Spencer

CPSO#: 87599

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
265 Dundas Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mitchell Spencer Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 87599 )
Dr. C. Brown ( CPSO# 89059 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:29 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MITCHELL SPENCER BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Sep 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 24 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2010