skip to content

Brown, Meaghan Lise

CPSO#: 93053

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Mahler, Meaghan Lise (used until: 26 Aug 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Thorold Lane
Ingleside ON  K0C 1M0
Phone: (613) 537-2044
Fax: 613-543-4171 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

566 Louise St.
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

34 Ottawa St
Morrisburg ON  K0C 1X0
Canada
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Meaghan Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 93053 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEAGHAN LISE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2013