skip to content

Brown, Marty Harold

CPSO#: 84849

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Jul 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 - 145 Station St
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone: (613) 771-1910
Fax: (613) 968-6303 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Marty Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 08 Jul 2019 Active
             As from July 8, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Marty Harold Brown,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Brown to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. MARTY HAROLD BROWN
                                          ("Dr. Brown")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and links to the current regulatory lists are
                        attached hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety and
                  Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, with a link to the
                  current regulatory list attached hereto at Schedule "C".
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Brown, certificate of registration number 84849, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7216038 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of
                  controlled substances.

            (4)   I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this
                  Undertaking, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective immediately (the "Effective Date").

            (6)   I, Dr. Brown, shall keep a Log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and Monitored Drugs, in the form attached as set out
                  in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following information
                  (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                        (i)   the date of the appointment;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction,
                              number of tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                        (iv)  the clinical indication;
                        (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or
                              different dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the
                              patient (Y/N); 
                        (vi)  Dr. Brown's signature;
                        (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable,
                              as set out below); and
                        (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set
                              out below).
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and Monitored Drugs, in the corresponding
                  patient chart.

            (8)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:
                  
                        i.    Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Schedule "F";
                  
                        ii.   Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        iii.  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        iv.   Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting to whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                              Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                              Targeted Substances and Monitored Drugs since the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s)'s prior review, or if since the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s)'s prior review there are not 15 patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and Monitored
                              Drugs, then the charts of all patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review;
                  
                        v.    Sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the charts that
                              the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed with
                              me;
                  
                        vi.   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        vii.  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        viii. Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        ix.   Submit a written report to the College at the completion of
                              the Clinical Supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "F" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report of the assessor dated January 12, 2019, and concerns that
                        may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        reasonable recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including
                        but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and
                        ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections 8(e) and/or
                        8(f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section 8(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "F",
                        including but not limited to, the following elements of
                        professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safer
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                        (ii)  University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Medical
                              Record-Keeping:  http://www.cpd.utoronto.ca/recordkeeping/;
                  
                        (iii) Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                  
                              1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                  
                              2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;
                                    and
                  
                              3.    CPSO Policy "Medical Records":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy
                                    /Medical-Records
                  
                        (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                        specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                        participant assessment reports where available, within one (1)
                        month of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College
                        will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed each element of the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake to complete this requirement by three
                        months from the date I sign this Undertaking, or, if no
                        satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first
                        possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (10)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section 8
                        above and Schedule "E" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment
                        may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Brown, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Brown, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (17)  I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section 18(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Brown
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                              his prescribing of controlled substances. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Brown will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3
                                    months. 
                  
                                    Dr. Brown will engage in professional education in
                                    prescribing and medical record-keeping.
                  
                                    Dr. Brown's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College approximately six months
                                    following the end of the period of Clinical
                                    Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Brown, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Brown, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Brown, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Brown, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or 
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 8, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Marty Harold Brown to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 8, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Brown engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Brown will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Brown will engage in professional education in prescribing and medical record-keeping.

Dr. Brown’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately six months following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.