skip to content

Brown, Kristen Leigh

CPSO#: 95008

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Nov 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective:15 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Nov 2013