skip to content

Brown, James Edward

CPSO#: 27495

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.E. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre University Hospital 399 Windermere Road london ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 01 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018