skip to content

Brown, Isabella Patricia

CPSO#: 19611

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Sep 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 13-Sep-2000

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1946

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Oct 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993