skip to content

Brown, Christopher Allan

CPSO#: 97993

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
801 Mohawk Rd W, Suite 202
Hamilton ON  l9c6c2
Phone: 905-383-8431
Fax: 905-387-3965 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Health Clinics - Brantford
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S0C5
Canada
Phone: 5197539581
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

801 Mohawk Rd W
Hamilton ON  L9C6C2
Canada
Phone: (905) 388-2447
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ALLAN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2014