skip to content

Brown, Carolyn Elizabeth

CPSO#: 30763

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Dec 2020
EXPIRY DATE
02 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Ashbourne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brown ( CPSO# 30763 )
Dr. J. Ashbourne ( CPSO# 31866 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5022

Business Address:
Haliburton Highland Health Services
6 McPherson Drive
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Phone Number: (705) 286-0256

Medical Records Location

Address: Peterborough Clinic 26 Hospital Drive Peterborough, ON K9J 7C3
Date Received: 02 Dec 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Dec 2020