skip to content

Brown, Andrew Dale

CPSO#: 95730

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 9053784647 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416)864-5692
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew D. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 95730 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW DALE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2019