Brown, Amanda Kelly (CPSO#: 98990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 310
80 Maria Street
Tavistock ON  N0B 2R0
Phone: (519) 655-2322
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amanda K. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 98990 )

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
80 Maria Street
Box 310
Tavistock ON  N0B 2R0
Phone Number: (519) 655-2322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA KELLY BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jul 2012 to 25 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014