skip to content

Bross, Adee Hadassah

CPSO#: 88777

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Futurity Medical Clinic
Suite 305
745 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N4
Phone: (416) 487-2052 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeremy I. Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bross ( CPSO# 88777 )
Dr. J. Cohen ( CPSO# 88783 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
PACE Cardiology Clinic
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Business Address:
Futurity Medical Clinic
Suite 305
745 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N4
Phone Number: (416) 487-2052

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADEE HADASSAH BROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010