skip to content

Brosky, Shirley Irene

CPSO#: 25733

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com; North Burlington Medical Centre Suite 18 1960 Appleby Line Burlington, ON L7L 0B7
Instructions: Medical records are located at Records Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. or North Burlington Medical Centre.
Date Received: 17 Apr 2014


Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 15 Dec 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014