skip to content

Brosh-Katz, Nirit

CPSO#: 91050

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 17 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013