skip to content

Brophy, Julie Dawn

CPSO#: 93042

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H1B1
Phone: 519-265-4041
Fax: 519-837-3454 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Julie D. Brophy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brophy ( CPSO# 93042 )

Business Address:
Unit 107
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 265-4041

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:27 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIE DAWN BROPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015