skip to content

Brooks, Lisa Hailey

CPSO#: 97151

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. Brooks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Brooks ( CPSO# 97151 )

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:03 Jan 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active
 Dr.  Lisa  Hailey  Brooks  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  internal
            medicine, only.