Brooks, Jennifer Ashley (CPSO#: 101046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Lanark Community HealthCentre
207 Robertson Drive
Lanark ON  K0G 1K0
Phone: (613) 259-2182
Fax: (613) 259-5235
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ASHLEY BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015