skip to content

Brookes, Jonathan

CPSO#: 94090

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Manchester Medical School, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital Site
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 34422 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: JON BROOKES MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brookes ( CPSO# 94090 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Jul 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective:27 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Jonathan Brookes may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anesthesia and Perioperative Medicine, University of Western
                        Ontario, in which Dr. Brookes holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Brookes no
                  longer holds the academic appointment referred to in clause 1.