skip to content

Brook, John Roger

CPSO#: 16892

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 May 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1958
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 May 2016

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: May 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Roger Brook to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 17, 2016:

Dr. Brook was the subject of a complaint about his conduct and his standard of practice in his family practice. During the investigation, Dr. Brook resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)