skip to content

Bronicheski, Alicia Victoria

CPSO#: 98655

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Welland Hospital
65 Third St
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alicia Bronicheski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bronicheski ( CPSO# 98655 )

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2

Business Address:
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7

Business Address:
230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALICIA VICTORIA BRONICHESKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRONICHESKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016