skip to content

CPSO#: 90954

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sandra Bromley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bromley ( CPSO# 90954 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Business Address:
29 - 1910 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Business Address:
Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANDRA TRICIA BROMLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROMLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014