skip to content

Brockerville, Melissa Anne

CPSO#: 91068

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (709) 351-6290 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (709) 351-6290
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Sciences Centre 300 Prince Phillip Drive St Johns NL A1B 3V6
Date Received: 08 Aug 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 27 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA ANNE BROCKERVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROCKERVILLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2018