skip to content

Broadhurst, Peter Kaas

CPSO#: 98244

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. John's Rehab
285 Cummer Ave
Toronto, ON, M2M 2G1
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Phone: 416-226-6780 Ext. 7980 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Hospital
Neurophysiology/EMG
M1-600
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-4475
Fax: 416-480-4674
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER KAAS BROADHURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROADHURST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017