skip to content

Broad, Kathleen Louise

CPSO#: 95458

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 May 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
Special Services Unit
211 - 90 John St S
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y8
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Ext. 2205 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Broad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Broad ( CPSO# 95458 )

Business Address:
NPOP - CAMH 250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (519) 535-8501

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
Special Services Unit
Room 209
90 John Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 6K7
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN LOUISE BROAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2017