Bristow, Lucas Thompson (CPSO#: 96452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6387 Morrison Street, Suite 2
Niagara Falls, ON
L2E 7H1
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone: 905-358-1818
Fax: 905-357-2734
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lucas Bristow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bristow ( CPSO# 96452 )

Business Address:
300 - 6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone Number: (905) 358-1818

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCAS THOMPSON BRISTOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRISTOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015