skip to content

Briscoe, Graham Arthur

CPSO#: 100672

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler Kennedy
Sport Medicine Clinic
Western University 3M Centre
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3011
Fax: 5196613379 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Graham Briscoe, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Briscoe ( CPSO# 100672)

Business Address:
Fowler Kennedy Sports Medicine Clinic
Western University 3M Centre
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GRAHAM ARTHUR BRISCOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRISCOE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015