skip to content

Brijbassi, Melissa Mala

CPSO#: 97739

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Disera Drive Unit 100
Thornhill ON  L4J0A7
Phone: 905-771-7755
Fax: 905-771-7752 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  M5G 1V7
Canada
Phone: 416-883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:06 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA MALA BRIJBASSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIJBASSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2016