skip to content

Brigden, Malcolm

CPSO#: 82385

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jan 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Northeast Cancer Center
Department of Medical Oncology
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: 4033604951 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Malcolm Brigden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 14 2008
Corporation Name: Malcolm Brigden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2013
Corporation Name: Dr. MALCOLM BRIGDEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brigden ( CPSO# 82385 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:11 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:18 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MALCOLM BRIGDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIGDEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2021