skip to content

Bailey, Brian Clare

CPSO#: 21879

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 01 May 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 May 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
499 Sunnyside Ave. #109
Ottawa ON  K1A 0S8
Phone: 613-867-0561 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 24 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2020
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 01 May 2020


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2020 Active

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 May 2019
Summary:

On May 6, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bailey committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all circumstances, would reasonably be 
 regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. On December 
12, 2019, there was a penalty hearing. Following the hearing, the Committee reserved its 
 decision. On February 3, 2020, the Discipline Committee released its decision and 
 reasons on penalty. 
  
 Dr. Bailey is a 76-year-old general practitioner who received his certificate of registration 
 for independent practice in 1969. Dr. Bailey’s practice is located in Ottawa and consists 
 of group psychotherapy, some individual psychotherapy and acupuncture. He is a short-
 term mental health provider and selects patients referred to him to attend his 
 “AcuDestress Program”. 
  
 Dr. Bailey was brought to the attention of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports 
 Committee (“ICRC”) by the College’s Quality Assurance Committee in 2015. The ICRC 
 determined after investigation and review that there were aspects of Dr. Bailey’s 
 practice that were either unacceptable or deficient and that failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice. Further, the ICRC was of the view that Dr. Bailey was remediable in 
these areas. On May 4, 2016, the ICRC ordered that Dr. Bailey undergo a specified 
continuing education or remediation program (a   “SCERP”) to address the ICR 
Committee’s concerns and to protect the public interest. The May 4, 2016 SCERP 
 included the following components: 
  
    -  Dr. Bailey shall attend and successfully complete the following four courses: the 
       Medical Record Keeping Course offered through the University of Toronto; the 
       Canadian Medical Protective Association’s (“CMPA”) e-modules on medical 
       record keeping; the Understanding Boundaries Course, offered through the 
       Schulich School of Medicine, at University of Western Ontario; and the CMPA 
       module on Privacy and Confidentiality. 
    -  Dr. Bailey shall review and provide a written summary (including how they are 
       applicable to his situation as well as how he plans to change his practice) of the 
       following documents: the College’s policies on Complementary Alternative 
       Medicine, Telemedicine, Consent to Treatment, Confidentiality of Personal Health 
       Information, Maintaining Appropriate Boundaries and Preventing Sexual Abuse, 
       and Medical Records; and the Ontario Regulation 144/94 or the “Advertising 
       regulation,” and the CMPA Good Practice Guide, section on “e-communication”; 
    -  Dr. Bailey shall engage in focused educational sessions, in person, with a clinical 
       supervisor acceptable to the College (the Clinical Supervisor); and 
    -  Dr. Bailey shall undergo a reassessment, with an assessor selected by the 
       College approximately six months following completion of the educational plan. 
  
 The allegation of professional misconduct in this matter arises from Dr. Bailey’s 
 response or lack thereof to the May 4, 2016 SCERP. 
                                       1 

  
 The Committee found that Dr. Bailey failed to comply with the May 4, 2016 SCERP as 
 required by the ICRC, including that he failed to comply with the schedule set out for 
 completion of the courses, he failed to secure a clinical supervisor in a timely manner, 
 and he unreasonably delayed the completion of all of its elements. The Committee also 
 found that Dr. Bailey’s failure to communicate either in person or through his counsel 
 were an attempt to thwart or delay the process. Such behavior by members of the 
 profession in the view of the Committee is not tolerable. 
  
 The Committee noted that panels of the Discipline Committee have made findings of 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in prior cases based on a failure 
to comply with or breach of orders of College Committees, including the failure to 
 adhere to a SCERP.  
  
 It is clear from Dr. Bailey’s testimony that he believed that the SCERP was unfair. His 
manner of dealing with the situation was to agree to undertake the required 
 remediation, but to thwart the schedule for its completion. Dr. Bailey understood his 
 obligation to comply with the May 4, 2016 SCERP. He delayed complying with the 
 SCERP after his return to practice and to date, has completed it only in part. He failed to 
 communicate in a professional manner with the College staff assigned to his case, 
 despite their repeated efforts to keep the matter moving forward. Dr. Bailey’s actions in 
 securing a supervisor were unhelpful and obstructive. There is no acceptable excuse for 
 this behavior. 
  
 The Committee found that Dr. Bailey engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or 
 unprofessional conduct as alleged. 
  
 Disposition 
  
 On February 3, 2020, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
  
 - Dr. Bailey be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand shall be recorded on the 
 Register; 
  
 - The Registrar suspend Dr. Bailey’s certificate of registration commencing 14 days 
 following the date of release of the order until the later of: 
  
       (i)   Four months after the date the suspension commences; or 
       (ii)  The date Dr. Bailey provides to the College proof of his successful 
             completion of the PROBE Ethics and Boundaries course. 
  
 - The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Bailey’s 
 certificate of registration: 
  
                                       2 

    (i) Dr. Bailey shall comply with all outstanding requirements of the SCERP as set 
          forth in the Decision and Reasons of the ICRC, dated May 4, 2016. The 
          reference to “a boundaries course” will mean the PROBE Ethics and 
          Boundaries Course (rather than the Understanding Boundaries course which 
          Dr. Bailey previously attended); and 
    (ii) Dr. Bailey shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical Practice”. 
  
 - Dr. Bailey pay to the College costs in the amount of $31,110.00, in equal quarterly 
 payments over the course of two years, to commence within 30 days from the date of 
 release of this order and to be completed within 24 months. 
  
  
 NOTE: On February 14, 2020, Dr. Bailey provided notice of his appeal to the Superior 
 Court of Justice (Divisional Court) from the decisions of the Discipline Committee of the 
 College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario dated May 6, 2019 and February 3, 2020. 
 Pursuant to ss.25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, the decision of the 
 Discipline Committee is stayed pending the outcome of the appeal. 
  
 On May 1, 2020, Dr. Bailey provided notice that he filed an Abandonment of Appeal in 
the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court) on April 30, 2020. The effect of the 
abandonment is that the Discipline Committee’s order  contained in its decision dated 
February 3, 2020 is no longer stayed and is immediately in full force and effect.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing dates: February 11 & 12, 2019 Penalty hearing date: December 12, 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 17, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)