Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: July 16, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
BAIL CONDITIONS
On July 5, 2021, the following conditions of release (bail conditions) were imposed on Brian Nadler:
1. Reside at an address approved by surety.
2. Notify the specified Officer in Charge (or designate) at Hawkesbury OPP of your address in writing within 24 hours of your release.
3. Notify the specified Officer in Charge (or designate) at Hawkesbury OPP of any change in your address.
4. Remain in Canada.
5. Do not associate or communicate in any way, either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with a) employees of Hawkesbury General Hospital and b) patients and relatives treated at Hawkesbury General Hospital except in the presence of counsel for the purpose of preparing a defence.
6. Do not practice medicine.
Source:
Other
Active Date: March 26, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CHARGES
Brian Jacobs Nadler was charged with the following offences:
1. Four counts of First Degree Murder, on or about March 25, 2021, contrary to Section 231(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of charge: March 26, 2021 and August 11, 2022; Indictment May 25, 2023
Place of charge: Hawkesbury, Ontario
Ontario Provincial Police