skip to content

Brezina, Jeanie Shkimba

CPSO#: 18854

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1963
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 14 Feb 1998
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 22 May 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 May 1999
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 May 1999
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Jan 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012