skip to content

Brennand, Shirley Zeta Abigail

CPSO#: 13537

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:03 Dec 1955 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1951
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Feb 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005