skip to content

Brennan, Erin Elizabeth

CPSO#: 92930

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3232
Fax: (613) 548-1374 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chaplin Brennan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Brennan ( CPSO# 92930 )
Dr. T. Chaplin ( CPSO# 88601 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN ELIZABETH BRENNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRENNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015