skip to content

Breiner, Ariel

CPSO#: 89064

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Room ES-08
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613)-798-5555 Ext. 16221
Fax: (613)-761-5403 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Liebman & A. Breiner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Liebman ( CPSO# 88470 )
Dr. A. Breiner ( CPSO# 89064 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Hematology-Oncology
401 Smyth Road
Room 2630
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Room C2196
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARIEL BREINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREINER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2011