skip to content

Breau, Melanie Danielle

CPSO#: 92869

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Eastern Ontario Health Centre
for Kids (NEO Kids)
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7120 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Breau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Breau ( CPSO# 92869 )

Business Address:
North Eastern Ontario Health Centre
for Kids (NEO Kids)
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:16 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE DANIELLE BREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 10 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2015