skip to content

Brault, David

CPSO#: 91380

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Hamilton st
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: (519) 846-5345
Fax: (519) 846-8544 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W2
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Brault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brault ( CPSO# 91380 )

Business Address:
21 Hamilton Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (519) 846-5345

Business Address:
801 St. David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W2
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID BRAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011