skip to content

Braude, Paul Robert

CPSO#: 28820

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
19 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul Braude Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 17 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 2900 Steeles Ave E Thornhill, ON L3T 4X1
Date Received: 25 Mar 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2021