skip to content

Brastianos, Charilaos Harry

CPSO#: 95454

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2021